Global Patent Index - EP 0780530 B1

EP 0780530 B1 2001-02-28 - Cylinderlock for locking systems

Title (en)

Cylinderlock for locking systems

Title (de)

Zylinderschloss für Schliessanlagen

Title (fr)

Serrure cylindrique pour systèmes de fermetures

Publication

EP 0780530 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120291 A

Priority

DE 19548426 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780530A1] The key channel (4) and the key shaft in the height area (11) of the key notches have a bend (18) altering direction, the bending angle of which is less than 180 degrees. Within the height area in the upper key channel section (19) are arranged at least one longitudinal rib (8') and in the lower key channel section (20) at least one longitudinal rib (8''). The direction changing bend is V-shaped. The longitudinal rib of the upper key channel section and that of the lower key channel section are arranged on opposite sides of the key channel. The first longitudinal rib is arranged on the side of the key channel facing the bend angle and the second longitudinal rib on the side turned away from the bend angle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/00 (2006.01); E05B 19/06 (2006.01); E05B 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/0029 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FI FR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780530 A1 19970625; EP 0780530 B1 20010228; AT 199431 T 20010315; DE 19548426 A1 19970703; DE 19548426 C2 20031211

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-21 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161217

2016-12-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606501

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131218

2014-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 199431 T

- Effective date: 20131218

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121218

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20111222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-12-18 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2009-12-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-09-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ABUS PFAFFENHAIN GMBH.

2009-06-15 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: BERICHTIGUNG INHABER

2009-05-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ABUS SCHLIESSANLAGEN PFAFFENHAIN

- Free text: SCHLIESSANLAGEN GMBH PFAFFENHAIN#FABRIKSTRASSE 1#09387 PFAFFENHAIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ABUS SCHLIESSANLAGEN PFAFFENHAIN#ALTENHOFERWEG 25#58300 WETTER (DE)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SCHLIESSANLAGEN GMBH PFAFFENHAIN

- Free text: SCHLIESSANLAGEN GMBH PFAFFENHAIN#FABRIKSTRASSE 1#09387 PFAFFENHAIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SCHLIESSANLAGEN GMBH PFAFFENHAIN#FABRIKSTRASSE 1#09387 PFAFFENHAIN (DE)

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-08-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUF GRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 09.08.2002 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2002-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DR. ING. AUSSERER ANTON

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606501 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR IT LI NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199431 T 20010315

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990913

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971205

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR IT LI NL PT SE