Global Patent Index - EP 0780566 B1

EP 0780566 B1 2000-11-15 - Mounting device of a suction module of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Mounting device of a suction module of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Saugmoduls an einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un module d'aspiration d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0780566 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117270 A

Priority

DE 19548024 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19548024C1] The suction module (2) is fastened to the cylinder head cover (4) via a support unit (11). This is at least partially formed by the oil filler line (16). The module is formed as a multifunction part. It comprises of the oil filler line, an oil filler socket (17), at least one first fastener unit (19) associated with the cylinder head cover, and a second fastener unit (20) associated with the module (2). Support unit and oil separator (18) are connected to form an integral part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/10; F01M 11/04; F01M 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/04 (2006.01); F01M 13/04 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10078 (2013.01); F01M 11/04 (2013.01); F01M 13/0416 (2013.01); F02F 7/006 (2013.01); F02M 35/112 (2013.01); F05C 2225/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19548024 C1 19961205; EP 0780566 A1 19970625; EP 0780566 B1 20001115; ES 2153530 T3 20010301; US 5690068 A 19971125

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051028

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-08-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-06-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20011028

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-10-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011028

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153530

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-01-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-10-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-08-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990408

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-09-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970509

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT