Global Patent Index - EP 0780575 B1

EP 0780575 B1 2003-06-11 - Gear machine

Title (en)

Gear machine

Title (de)

Zahnradmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à engrenages

Publication

EP 0780575 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114514 A

Priority

DE 19548613 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780575A1] The gear wheel machine has tooth flanks permanently engaged in a double engagement. The engagement points (12,A,E) of two tooth flanks move on a single engagement line (15) which runs at a small engagement angle (18) in the region of the pitch point (12). Sectors of oppositely curved spirals (19,20) meet at this angle. This gives a degree of cover of more than 2.0 in the region of up to sixteen teeth. The engagement line may run in a third-order parabola in the region of the pitch point of the gear wheel pair.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780575 A1 19970625; EP 0780575 B1 20030611; DE 19548613 A1 19970717; DE 19548613 C2 20030821

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090911

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080925

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060911

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060911

2005-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031006

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610528 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991230

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971229

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT