Global Patent Index - EP 0780635 B1

EP 0780635 B1 2001-02-28 - Tube for chimney renovation

Title (en)

Tube for chimney renovation

Title (de)

Kaminrohr für die Schornsteinsanierung

Title (fr)

Conduit pour la rénovation d'une cheminée

Publication

EP 0780635 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115960 A

Priority

DE 19547677 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19547677C1] Each tube section (1,2) has one end (3) widening in a cone and the other (4) tapering in a cone at the same angle. Both section ends are widened, and are of larger diameter over their entire length than the remainder of the section. Where the section wall joins onto the tapering end it can have an external step (8) with radiused edges. The diameter of the opening (5) at the tapering end can be the same as that of the main part of the section. An external step with radiused edges (6) can also be provided between the main part of the section and the widening end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23J 13/04; F16L 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16B 7/02 (2006.01); F16L 37/02 (2006.01); F23J 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 13/04 (2013.01); F23J 2213/202 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19547677 C1 19961212; DE 19547677 C2 20000127; AT 199454 T 20010315; CZ 290889 B6 20021113; CZ 9603708 A3 19970716; DK 0780635 T3 20010521; EP 0780635 A2 19970625; EP 0780635 A3 19980722; EP 0780635 B1 20010228; ES 2154769 T3 20010416; HU 9603497 A2 19970929; HU 9603497 A3 19981028; HU 9603497 D0 19970228; PL 183026 B1 20020531; PL 317527 A1 19970623

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161004

2017-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170126

2016-11-30 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 199454 T

- Effective date: 20161004

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161003

2016-10-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161003

2016-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-10 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20161004

2016-10-05 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161003

2016-10-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606503

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150904

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: STAHL- UND BLECHBAU SCHUBERT GMBH & CO. KG

2010-01-20 [R26D] OPPOSITION DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED (CORR.)

- Opponent name: STAHL- UND BLECHBAU SCHUBERT GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20020518

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-11-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 04/2002: THE OPPOSITION SHOULD BE DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED (SEE EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN 18.09.2002/38)

2002-09-18 [26D] OPPOSITION DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED

- Opponent name: STAHL- UND BLECHBAU SCHUBERT GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20020518

2002-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: STAHL- UND BLECHBAU SCHUBERT GMBH & CO. KG

2002-01-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: STAHL- UND BLECHBAU SCHUBERT GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20011128

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: IPSER S.R.L.

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154769 T3

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606503 20010405

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19961010;LV PAYMENT 19961010;SI PAYMENT 19961010

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199454 T 20010315

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000403

1999-12-03 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: RICCARDI SERGIO & CO.

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981006

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

1998-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 961010;LV PAYMENT 961010;SI PAYMENT 961010

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

1997-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 961010;LV PAYMENT 961010;SI PAYMENT 961010