Global Patent Index - EP 0780809 A3

EP 0780809 A3 2000-03-01 - PC-based open metering system and method

Title (en)

PC-based open metering system and method

Title (de)

PC-gestütztes offenes Zählsystem und dazugehöriges Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé et système ouvert de dosage basé sur un ordinateur personnel

Publication

EP 0780809 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96120519 A

Priority

  • US 57511295 A
  • US 57510995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780809A2] A transaction evidencing system includes a personal computer (PC) comprising a processor, memory and hard drive, with a plurality of non-metering application programs that selectively run on the PC. An unsecured printer is operatively coupled to the PC for printing in accordance with the non-metering application programs. A portable vault card that is removably coupled to the PC is programmed to generate tokens generation and perform transaction accounting. An application interface module in the PC, which interfaces with the non-metering application programs, issues a request for one digital tokens in response to requests for indicia from a non-metering application program. A secure communications module in the PC, which securely communicates with the vault card when the vault card is coupled to the PC, sends the request for digital token to the vault card and receives a digital token generated by the vault card. An indicia bitmap generation module generates an indicia bitmap in the PC from the digital token and stores it in memory. The indicia bitmap is accessed by the non-metering application program when a print indicia operation is selected. A transaction capture module in the PC stores on the hard drive a transaction record corresponding to each issued digital token and associated postal data. The application interface module, the secure communications module, the indicia bitmap generation module and the transaction capture module are part of a dynamic link library module in the PC.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/02 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 17/00314 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00177 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00201 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00322 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0033 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00338 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00346 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00411 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00427 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780809 A2 19970625; EP 0780809 A3 20000301; EP 0780809 B1 20100324; CA 2193434 A1 19970620; CA 2193434 C 20020219; DE 69638152 D1 20100506; JP H1027272 A 19980127

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141219

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141219

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69638152

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101228

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69638152 P 20100506

2010-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050330

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050330

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB