Global Patent Index - EP 0780848 B1

EP 0780848 B1 2002-12-18 - External pressure gas cable

Title (en)

External pressure gas cable

Title (de)

Gasaussendruckkabel

Title (fr)

Câble à pression de gaz externe

Publication

EP 0780848 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117181 A

Priority

DE 19547230 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19644494A1] A gas-filled cable arrangement has conductors surrounded by dielectric impregnated with fluid. The conductors have metal pressure sleeves and are mounted in a pressure-tight pipe where there is a gas pressure of more than ten bars. The metal sleeve (4) for each conductor 95) is corrugated and is hermetically sealed inside the pipe 914). The impregnating fluid is lightweight insulating oil. The diameter and wall thickness of the pressure sleeve are chosen so that the pressure inside the sleeve is hydrostatically dependent on the outer gas pressure. The pressure sleeve is made from high quality steel. The dielectric is paper. The conductors are stranded together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 9/0622 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19644494 A1 19970619; EP 0780848 A1 19970625; EP 0780848 B1 20021218; NO 964534 A 19970619; NO 964534 D0 19961025

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-11-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-06-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021218

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610003 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610003 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FELTEN & GUILLEAUME KABELWERKE GMBH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020305

1998-11-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FELTEN & GUILLEAUME AG

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970325

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT