Global patent index - EP 0780858 B1

EP 0780858 B1 2000-02-23 - Miniature device to execute a predetermined function, in particular a microrelay

Title (en)

Miniature device to execute a predetermined function, in particular a microrelay

Title (de)

Miniaturvorrichtung zur Durchführung einer vorbestimmten Funktion, insbesondere Mikro-Relais

Title (fr)

Dispositif miniature pour exécuter une fonction prédeterminée,notamment microrelais

Publication

EP 0780858 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402827 A

Priority

FR 9515371 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780858A1] The microminiature relay mechanism includes a swinging arm mechanism (19) which is flexible and mounted on a central bridge (28). The two arm ends have magnetic material end strips (20,21). The substrate has a lower magnetic layer (6a,6b) and side protruding magnetic contacts (9) matching the magnetic arm ends. Magnetic coils (10,10a,10b,11,11a,11b) are provided by photoetching magnetic strips on the substrate surface. The magnetic circuit at either end can selectively close the arm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/00; H01H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 13/04 (2006.01); H01H 49/00 (2006.01); H01H 50/00 (2006.01); H01H 51/22 (2006.01); H01L 21/302 (2006.01); H01L 49/00 (2006.01); H01H 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/005 (2013.01); H01H 1/20 (2013.01); H01H 2050/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780858 A1 19970625; EP 0780858 B1 20000223; DE 69606760 D1 20000330; DE 69606760 T2 20001012; FR 2742917 A1 19970627; FR 2742917 B1 19980213; JP H09198983 A 19970731; US 5889452 A 19990330

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69606760

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101219

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101219

2011-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: COLIBRYS SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100108

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: PATENTS & TECHNOLOGY SURVEYS SA;RUE DES TERREAUX 7 CASE POSTALE 2848;2001 NEUCHATEL (CH)

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2002-03-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-03-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CSEM CENTRE SUISSE D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE MICROTECHN

2001-12-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: C.S.E.M. CENTRE SUISSE D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE MICROT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN4

2000-07-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606760

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-30

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-02-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000223

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990324

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971031

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI