Global Patent Index - EP 0780954 B1

EP 0780954 B1 2000-08-16 - Permanent magnet synchronous electric machine adapted to deliver constant power over a large speed range

Title (en)

Permanent magnet synchronous electric machine adapted to deliver constant power over a large speed range

Title (de)

Permanent Magnet-Synchronmaschine geeignet zur Abgabe konstanter Leistung in einen grossen Geschwindigkeitsbereich

Title (fr)

Machine électrique synchrone à aimants permanents adaptée à fonctionner à puissance constante sur une large plage de vitesse

Publication

EP 0780954 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402797 A

Priority

FR 9515408 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780954A1] The electric machine includes the stator (19) which includes the polyphase armature with a number of teeth (21) separating grooves (22) in which the turns of the coils are wound. The rotor (1) around its periphery has a predetermined number of pole pieces (3), each separated by at least one permanent magnet (2) of predetermined thickness and magnetised radially or axially. There is a separation (10), formed by an abutment (11), between the radial walls of the magnet and the pole pieces to prevent any risk of demagnetising the permanent magnets when the current is a maximum, notably at a short circuit. The power supply may be DC accumulators and the control (24) is a standard regulator with position sensor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 1/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02K 19/02 (2006.01); H02K 1/27 (2006.01); H02K 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 1/278 (2013.01); H02K 21/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780954 A1 19970625; EP 0780954 B1 20000816; DE 69609807 D1 20000921; DE 69609807 T2 20010301; FR 2742936 A1 19970627; FR 2742936 B1 19980213; JP 2912277 B2 19990628; JP H09298864 A 19971118

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69609807

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. MOTEURS LEROY-SOMER

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-02-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-11-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609807 20000921

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT LU NL SE

2000-08-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990201

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970701

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT LU NL SE