Global Patent Index - EP 0781232 B1

EP 0781232 B1 2000-11-02 - INTEGRAL BLANK FOR A FOLDING BOX WITH AN INSERT, AND FOLDING BOX PRODUCED THEREFROM

Title (en)

INTEGRAL BLANK FOR A FOLDING BOX WITH AN INSERT, AND FOLDING BOX PRODUCED THEREFROM

Title (de)

EINTEILIGER ZUSCHNITT FÜR EINE FALTSCHACHTEL MIT EINSATZ UND AUS DIESEM HERGESTELLTE FALTSCHACHTEL

Title (fr)

EBAUCHE MONOBLOC POUR BOITE PLIANTE AVEC INSERT, ET BOITE PLIANTE AINSI REALISEE

Publication

EP 0781232 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96923826 A

Priority

  • DE 9601249 W
  • DE 19526335 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19526335C1] The invention concerns a folding box for packaging objects, said box having a cuboid body (10). Disposed in the body (10) is an insert (30, 30a) for holding the objects and a compartment (45) for an accompanying leaflet. According to the invention, the integral blank (46, 46a) of the folding box is designed such that the folding box can be produced in only a few folding steps. This object is achieved by the special arrangement of the insert (30, 30a) on a longitudinal bonding strip (15, 15a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/50; B65D 85/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/50 (2006.01); B65D 85/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/5016 (2013.01); B65D 85/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19526335 C1 19970123; BR 9606525 A 19971014; EP 0781232 A1 19970702; EP 0781232 B1 20001102; ES 2152540 T3 20010201; JP H10506355 A 19980623; PL 182292 B1 20011231; PL 319158 A1 19970721; US 5871145 A 19990216; WO 9703886 A1 19970206

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040712

2005-07-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040711

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-09-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040913

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-07-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-07-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040711

2003-07-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030723

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030722

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030721

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152540 T3

2001-01-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606088 20001207

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1998-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980424

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970806

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE