Global Patent Index - EP 0781260 B1

EP 0781260 B1 2001-12-12 - IGNITION ELEMENTS AND FINELY ADJUSTABLE IGNITION COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

IGNITION ELEMENTS AND FINELY ADJUSTABLE IGNITION COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

ANZÜNDELEMENTE UND FEIN ABSTUFBARE ZÜNDSÄTZE

Title (fr)

ELEMENTS ET COMPOSITIONS D'AMOR AGE A SENSIBILITE FINEMENT REGLABLE

Publication

EP 0781260 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95932725 A

Priority

  • DE 4432521 A
  • EP 9503589 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19533487A1] The ignition element, consisting of a combination of 2 detonators, comprises a first detonator (hot wire detonator) contg. initiator(s), heat dissipating additive(s), oxidant(s) and a binder, and a second detonator (output detonator) contg. constituent(s) producing hot reaction particles, an oxidant and a binder. Also claimed are a 2-component ignition element in which the first detonator contains a heat-dissipating initiator and opt. a heat dissipating additive; and the first and second detonator per se.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06C 7/00; C06C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 31/18 (2006.01); C06B 35/00 (2006.01); C06B 45/14 (2006.01); C06C 7/00 (2006.01); C06C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 45/14 (2013.01); C06C 7/00 (2013.01); C06C 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19533487 A1 19960314; AT 210619 T 20011215; CZ 296695 B6 20060517; CZ 9700707 A3 19971112; EP 0781260 A1 19970702; EP 0781260 B1 20011212; EP 1110928 A1 20010627; JP H10505573 A 19980602; KR 100407715 B1 20040330; PL 181960 B1 20011031; PL 319093 A1 19970721; WO 9608454 A1 19960321

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59509947

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59509947

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130912

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-12-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AB, SE

- Effective date: 20111123

2011-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59509947

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BECKER & MUELLER, DE

2005-11-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DYNAMIT NOBEL G.M.B.H. EXPLOSIVSTOFF- UND SYSTEMT

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-03-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509947 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210619 T 20011215

1997-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970818

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970410

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE