Global Patent Index - EP 0781323 B1

EP 0781323 B1 2001-05-23 - ENZYME-CONTAINING WASHING AND BLEACHING AGENT IN POWDER FORM

Title (en)

ENZYME-CONTAINING WASHING AND BLEACHING AGENT IN POWDER FORM

Title (de)

PULVERFÖRMIGES, ENZYMHALTIGES BLEICH- UND WASCHMITTEL

Title (fr)

AGENT DE LAVAGE ET DE BLANCHIMENT EN POUDRE CONTENANT DES ENZYMES

Publication

EP 0781323 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95932676 A

Priority

  • DE 4433027 A
  • EP 9503506 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4433027A1] A washing and bleaching agent in powder form contains oxidant and cellulase. According to the invention, for 1 wt. % oxidant, said agent contains cellulase having an activity ranging from 0.005 CEVU to 10.5 CEVU, and 1 to 20 wt. % bleach activator. The agent can be used to wash coloured textiles without their loosing their colour, even after several washes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/38645 (2013.01); C11D 3/3907 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4433027 A1 19960321; AT 201440 T 20010615; EP 0781323 A1 19970702; EP 0781323 B1 20010523; ES 2158129 T3 20010901; JP H10506135 A 19980616; WO 9608554 A1 19960321

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020401

2003-05-21 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021227

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-06-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020401

2001-09-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-09-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158129 T3

2001-08-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509292 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201440 T 20010615

1997-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971001

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970308

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL