Global Patent Index - EP 0781367 B1

EP 0781367 B1 2000-06-28 - ROOF FOR A BUILDING

Title (en)

ROOF FOR A BUILDING

Title (de)

DACH EINES BAUWERKES

Title (fr)

TOIT D'UN BATIMENT

Publication

EP 0781367 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96920816 A

Priority

  • DE 19525374 A
  • EP 9602558 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19525374A1] The invention concerns a roof (17) for a building, which roof takes the form of a hollow body construction. It comprises interconnected walls (18, 19) of flexible material which is at least substantially impermeable to air. These walls (18, 19) form elongate hollow chambers (22) which are disposed in succession on the longitudinal sides and alternately form low pressure chambers (24) and over-pressure chambers (23), resulting in a highly stable cantilevered roof (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/20 (2013.01); E04H 2015/201 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19525374 A1 19970116; AT 194204 T 20000715; EP 0781367 A1 19970702; EP 0781367 B1 20000628; ES 2147383 T3 20000901; JP 3142139 B2 20010307; JP H10502985 A 19980317; US 5901504 A 19990511; WO 9703265 A1 19970130

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070613

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060613

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060613

2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040614

2005-06-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040613

2003-09-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030909

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030528

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030521

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147383 T3

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605495 20000803

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194204 T 20000715

2000-06-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MANZONI & MANZONI S.R.L.

1997-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FESTO AG & CO

1997-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970804

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970212

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI