Global Patent Index - EP 0781623 B1

EP 0781623 B1 2001-04-04 - Process for manufacturing brazed aluminium heat exchangers

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing brazed aluminium heat exchangers

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von hartgelöteten Aluminiumwärmetauschern

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'échangeurs de la chaleur en aluminium par brasage

Publication

EP 0781623 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118955 A

Priority

DE 19548244 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0781623A1] The method uses a flat tube structure formed as part of a heat exchanger. The tube is of an AlMnCu alloy and the inside of the tube is fitted with a turbulence generating insert (3) shaped to create a number of parallel flow channels. The insert can also be of the same material and is plated on both sides with a solder of AlSi having an addition of 0.2% Mg. The plating is about 10% of the thickness of the main insert. An alternative version has the channels created by deforming the tube section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23K 35/28; B23K 1/00; B32B 15/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 1/00 (2006.01); B23K 1/19 (2006.01); B23K 1/20 (2006.01); B23K 35/02 (2006.01); B23K 35/22 (2006.01); B23K 35/28 (2006.01); B32B 15/01 (2006.01); C22C 21/00 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01); F28F 1/40 (2006.01); F28F 3/02 (2006.01); F28F 13/12 (2006.01); F28F 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 21/084 (2013.01); B23K 1/203 (2013.01); B23K 35/0238 (2013.01); B32B 15/016 (2013.01); F28F 1/022 (2013.01); F28F 3/025 (2013.01); F28F 13/12 (2013.01); B23K 2201/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19548244 A1 19970626; DE 19548244 B4 20060302; EP 0781623 A1 19970702; EP 0781623 B1 20010404; JP 4037477 B2 20080123; JP H09206980 A 19970812; US 5839646 A 19981124

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606713

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAHLE INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG, 70469 STUTTGART, DE

- Document: DE 59606713

- Effective date: 20150304

2015-04-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606713

- Representative's name: GRAUEL, ANDREAS, DIPL.-PHYS. DR. RER. NAT., DE

- Effective date: 20150304

2015-03-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606713

- Representative's name: GRAUEL, ANDREAS, DIPL.-PHYS. DR. RER. NAT., DE

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130103

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59606713

- Effective date: 20121204

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111127

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111127

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010524

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606713 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000509

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971205

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT