Global Patent Index - EP 0781627 B1

EP 0781627 B1 2000-03-22 - Superfinishing machine

Title (en)

Superfinishing machine

Title (de)

Feinstbearbeitungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine de micro-finition

Publication

EP 0781627 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95120683 A

Priority

EP 95120683 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0781627A1] The fine polishing machine prepares a fine surface externally or internally on cylindrical surfaces. A flexible support head (8) is shaped to fit the curvature of the workpiece and an abrasive tape (12) is passed between the head and the workpiece to polish the workpiece. The tape is moved in a reciprocating motion. The flexible support head is prepared by slitting both sides of the support. The slits on opposite sides of the support are offset to each other. The support head is held in a C-shaped grip (5) at the end of one support arm (3) while the workpiece (1) is held at the end of a second support arm (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 5/42; B24B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/42 (2006.01); B24B 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/42 (2013.01); B24B 35/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0781627 A1 19970702; EP 0781627 B1 20000322; DE 59508072 D1 20000427

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111228

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59508072

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111228

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101117

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-16 [REG FR RM] CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RM

2001-05-25 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2001-05-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508072

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DAX

2000-03-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STEINWENDER, HORST

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980827

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960814

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT;LV;SI