Global Patent Index - EP 0781630 B1

EP 0781630 B1 2001-04-11 - Clamping device

Title (en)

Clamping device

Title (de)

Spannvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage

Publication

EP 0781630 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112841 A

Priority

DE 29520730 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0781630A1] The clamp has a clamping arm (8) which clamps a workpiece (3) onto a support surface (4). The clamping arm is joined to a pair of tilt supports (16,18) on a support base (5), all made from one plastics moulding. The movement of the separate sections of the moulding is provided by elastic hinge sections. The clamp has a forward-facing locking system to secure the clamped position. The drive for the clamp is from servo elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/12; F16B 2/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01); B25B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/16 (2013.01); B25B 5/061 (2013.01); B25B 5/064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29520730 U1 19960215; EP 0781630 A1 19970702; EP 0781630 B1 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050809

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030809

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-08-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030809

2002-08-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020816

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020806

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606760 20010517

2001-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO BREVETTI RAPISARDI S.R.L.

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971219

1997-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FESTO AG & CO

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970530

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT