Global Patent Index - EP 0781711 B1

EP 0781711 B1 2000-03-22 - Closure with tamper evident means

Title (en)

Closure with tamper evident means

Title (de)

Verschluss mit Originalitätssicherung

Title (fr)

Bouchon ayant un témoin apparent de l'inviolabilité de bouchage

Publication

EP 0781711 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402869 A

Priority

FR 9515567 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0781711A1] The cap comprises a body (4), which fits a container (2), has an opening (12). A cover (5) for the opening has an obturator (6) comprising a flexible lid (17) which originally is fixed to the body for blocking its opening but can be removed by wrenching. There is a joint (18) which, once the lid is removed and when the cover is in the closed position, seals the opening. The lid has in its periphery, an extended part (19) which initially and when the cover is closed, forms between the body and the cover, an externally visible use by date (20) which forms part of the tamperproof seal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/20 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0025 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0781711 A1 19970702; EP 0781711 B1 20000322; ES 2144222 T3 20000601; FR 2743053 A1 19970704; FR 2743053 B1 19980130; PT 781711 E 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2005-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031224

2004-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-12-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031224

2002-12-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20021126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144222 T3

2000-04-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NOVEMBAL

2000-04-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES IT PT

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990713

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970707

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES IT PT