Global Patent Index - EP 0781831 B1

EP 0781831 B1 2001-12-12 - Process for lowering the content of benzene and of light unsaturated compounds in hydrocarbon fractions

Title (en)

Process for lowering the content of benzene and of light unsaturated compounds in hydrocarbon fractions

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erniedrigung des Gehaltes von Benzol und von leichten ungesättigten Verbindungen in Kohlenwasserstofffraktionen

Title (fr)

Procédé de réduction sélective de la teneur en benzène et en composés insaturés légers d'une coupe d'hydrocarbures

Publication

EP 0781831 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402910 A

Priority

FR 9515529 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0781831A1] The treatment of a charge comprising mainly 5C hydrocarbons and containing at least one unsaturated 6C maximum compound including benzene comprises treating the charge in a distillation column consisting of a draining zone and a rectification zone associated with a hydrogenation reaction zone, comprising at least one catalytic bed, in which part of the unsaturated compounds are hydrogenated in the presence of a catalyst and a hydrogen (H2) flow; the charge from the reaction zone is sampled at a suitable level and returned to the distillation zone to ensure continuity of the process. From the head and base of the column are obtained effluents depleted in unsaturated compounds up to 6C; part of the head effluent (comprising 5 and/or 6C paraffins) is treated in an isomerisation zone in the presence of a catalyst to give an isomerate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 65/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 35/09 (2006.01); C10G 45/36 (2006.01); C10G 45/40 (2006.01); C10G 45/48 (2006.01); C10G 45/52 (2006.01); C10G 65/08 (2006.01); C10G 69/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 65/08 (2013.01); C10G 2400/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0781831 A1 19970702; EP 0781831 B1 20011212; CA 2194085 A1 19970628; CA 2194085 C 20070306; DE 69617892 D1 20020124; DE 69617892 T2 20020425; ES 2171636 T3 20020916; FR 2743081 A1 19970704; FR 2743081 B1 19980130; JP 3806810 B2 20060809; JP H09202886 A 19970805; KR 100447857 B1 20041112; KR 970033028 A 19970722; US 6048450 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151228

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151227

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151227

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-09-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151227

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69617892

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141014

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141203

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL-MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 69617892

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL-MALMAISON, HAUTS-DE-SEINE, FR

- Document: DE 69617892

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-12-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2171636 T3

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020225

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617892 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991025

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980102

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL