Global Patent Index - EP 0781886 B1

EP 0781886 B1 2000-09-20 - Covering for railtracks

Title (en)

Covering for railtracks

Title (de)

Abdeckung von Gleisanlagen

Title (fr)

Coverage d'une structure de voie ferrée

Publication

EP 0781886 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120688 A

Priority

DE 19548857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0781886A1] The holding components are formed as traverses (1) bridging over the track rail inner area and are fixed to the under side of the rails (3). The catchment components (9) are fixed to the traverses (1). The traverses extend laterally over the side of the rails turned away from the track rail inner area and are fixed on the extended parts further catchment components (4). The catchment components (9,14) support on distance holders (6) fixed on the traverses. The distance holders at different distances from a rail have differing heights. The gradient of the catchment components is defined through this height difference.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 19/006 (2013.01); E01B 2204/07 (2013.01); E01B 2204/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0781886 A1 19970702; EP 0781886 B1 20000920; AT 196518 T 20001015; DE 19548857 A1 19970710; DE 19548857 C2 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031220

2003-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ENVITEC-MALL - UMWELTSYSTEME G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010709

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KATZAROV S.A.

2001-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: ENVITEC-MALL - UMWELTSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG,GRUENER WEG 80,48268 GREVEN (DE) TRANSFER- ENVITEC-MALL - UMWELTSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG,BOSCHSTRASSE 2,48369 SAERBECK (DE)

2001-02-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605915 20001026

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR LI NL PT

2000-09-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196518 T 20001015

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENVITEC-MALL - UMWELTSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990304

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ENVITEC UMWELTSYSTEME GMBH & CO.

1998-05-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENVITEC UMWELTSYSTEME GMBH

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971201

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR LI NL PT