Global Patent Index - EP 0781951 B1

EP 0781951 B1 2001-05-30 - A sealing device

Title (en)

A sealing device

Title (de)

Dichtungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 0781951 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96116847 A

Priority

SE 9504699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0781951A1] A sealing device for sealing a space established by connecting two sealing surfaces (42b, 52b) positioned on one element each of two elements (44b, 48b), for example two concrete pipes, to a position in which the sealing surfaces face each other comprises a sealing body (80) consisting of elastic material. The sealing body (80) is adapted at the connection of the sealing surfaces (42b, 52b) to take a position in the space in which it engages the sealing surfaces. The sealing device comprises an activating device (82 - 90) for forcing the sealing body (80) positioned in the space against the sealing surfaces (42b, 52b) when the activating device is activated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 17/10; F16J 15/46; F16L 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16J 15/14 (2006.01); F16J 15/46 (2006.01); F16L 17/10 (2006.01); F16L 21/03 (2006.01); F16L 21/035 (2006.01); F16L 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16J 15/46 (2013.01); F16L 17/10 (2013.01); F16L 21/03 (2013.01); F16L 21/035 (2013.01); F16L 21/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0781951 A1 19970702; EP 0781951 B1 20010530; AT 201754 T 20010615; DE 69613089 D1 20010705; DE 69613089 T2 20010913; DE 69613089 T4 20021219; DK 0781951 T3 20010723; JP H09177992 A 19970711; SE 515033 C2 20010605; SE 9504699 D0 19951227; SE 9504699 L 19970628; US 5826887 A 19981027

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69613089

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-11-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TRELLEBORG PIPE SEALS LELYSTAD BV, NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FORSHEDA AB, FORSHEDA, SE

- Document: DE 69613089

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-11-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69613089

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER KASTEL SCHOBER, DE

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-11-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69613089

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER KASTEL SCHOBER PATENTANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-11-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69613089

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER SCHOBER SEIDEL PATENTANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-09-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69613089

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER KASTEL SCHOBER, DE

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031019

2004-06-07 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031019

2003-10-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031019

2002-10-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021016

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-04 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20021004

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-04 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20021004

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021003

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-07-19 [ET1] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** REVISION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE PATENT OR THE CLAIMS

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-10-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-07-23 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2001-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69613089 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201754 T 20010615

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991108

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971222

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE