Global Patent Index - EP 0782350 A3

EP 0782350 A3 2000-05-17 - Method for activating and executing secured functions in a communication system

Title (en)

Method for activating and executing secured functions in a communication system

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aktivieren und Ausführen von gesicherten Funktionen in einem Kommunikationssystem

Title (fr)

Procédé pour activer et exécuter des fonctions sécurisée dans un système de communication

Publication

EP 0782350 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96119028 A

Priority

DE 19549014 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19549014C1] The protected function activation system responds to a signal (amo) received from a peripheral device (PC) of the communication system (KS) for initiating a security routine, before the protected function (FAA) is activated. The security routine allows an encoded interrogation information (afi), specific to each protected function, to be transmitted periodically, with evaluation of an encoded response information (ai) received from the peripheral device within a given time frame, for activating the protected function.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 3/545; H04M 3/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/34 (2013.01); G06F 21/62 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04M 3/22 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04Q 3/545 (2006.01); G06F 1/00 (2006.01); G06F 12/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/22 (2013.01); G06F 21/305 (2013.01); G06F 21/34 (2013.01); G06F 21/629 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04M 3/42323 (2013.01); H04Q 3/54566 (2013.01); G06F 12/1408 (2013.01); G06F 2211/007 (2013.01); G06F 2221/2103 (2013.01); H04L 63/0853 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5247577 A 19930921 - BAILEY DELBERT D [US], et al
  • [A] DE 4306054 A1 19930902 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [A] SENECHAL J M: "OSIRIS MILITARY INFRASTRUCTURE SWITCH", ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION, vol. 65, no. 3, 1 May 1992 (1992-05-01), ROMFORD, GB, pages 226 - 231, XP000304883, ISSN: 0013-4252
  • [A] TAKUMI K: "BASE TECHNOLOGIES FOR C&C INTEGRATIONS", NEC RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, no. 96, 1 March 1990 (1990-03-01), TOKYO, JP, pages 57 - 82, XP000136296, ISSN: 0547-051X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19549014 C1 19970220; CN 1076556 C 20011219; CN 1158523 A 19970903; EP 0782350 A2 19970702; EP 0782350 A3 20000517; EP 0782350 B1 20050831; IN 191616 B 20031206; SG 79926 A1 20010417; US 5864624 A 19990126

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161126

2016-12-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161126

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-05-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-11-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2005-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LUKAS, GUENTER, ING.

2005-08-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAMBERGER, FRIEDRICH, ING.

2005-08-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GIESE, PETER, ING.

2005-08-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPAHL, SIEGFRIED, ING.

2004-07-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1000857

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT