Global patent index - EP 0782388 A4

EP 0782388 A4 2000-03-08 - PHOTODYNAMIC INACTIVATION OF VIRAL AND BACTERIAL BLOOD CONTAMINANTS WITH HALOGENATED COUMARIN AND FUROCOUMARIN SENSITIZERS

Title (en)

PHOTODYNAMIC INACTIVATION OF VIRAL AND BACTERIAL BLOOD CONTAMINANTS WITH HALOGENATED COUMARIN AND FUROCOUMARIN SENSITIZERS

Title (de)

PHOTODYNAMISCHE INAKTIVIERUNG VON VIRALEN UND BAKTERIELLEN BLUTKOMBINANTEN MIT HALOGENIERTEN COUMARIN-UND FUOROCOUMARIN-SENSIBILATOREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INACTIVATION PHOTODYNAMIQUE DE CONTAMINANTS DU SANG DE NATURE VIRALE ET BACTERIENNE A L'AIDE DE SENSIBILISANTS A LA COUMARINE OU LA FUROCOUMARINE

Publication

EP 0782388 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95933899 A

Priority

  • US 9512069 W
  • US 31112594 A
  • US 34368094 A
  • US 42708095 A
  • US 46162695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9608965A1] Viral, bacterial and parasitic contaminants in biological compositions are photodynamically inactivated by mixing halogenated coumarin and furocoumarin photosensitizers with the biological composition and irradiating the mixture. The figure depicts the proposed energy diagram of the instant photosensitizers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 1/02; A01N 43/16; A61K 41/00; C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 41/0057 (2013.01); A61K 41/0019 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9314791 A2 19930805 - CRYOPHARM CORP [US]
  • [E] WO 9639816 A1 19961219 - CREDIT MANAGERS ASS OF CALIFOR [US]
  • [X] WO 9007952 A1 19900726 - BISACCIA EMIL [US], et al
  • [X] DATABASE CHEMABS [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; MIOLO, G. ET AL: "Antiretroviral activity of furocoumarins plus UVA light detected by a replication-defective retrovirus", XP002126268, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 122:50251 & J. PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., B (1994), 26(3), 241-7J. PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., B (1994), 26(3), 241-7
  • [X] DATABASE CHEMABS [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; LYTLE, C. DAVID ET AL: "Antiviral activity of gilvocarcin V plus UVA radiation", XP002126269, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 120:100767 & PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL. (1993), 58(6), 818-21PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL. (1993), 58(6), 818-21
  • [X] DATABASE CHEMABS [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; RONTO, GYORGYI ET AL: "Action spectra for photoinduced inactivation of bacteriophage T7 sensitized by 8-methoxypsoralen and angelicin", XP002126270, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 111:170121 & J. PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., B (1989), 3(4), 497-507J. PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., B (1989), 3(4), 497-507
  • [X] DATABASE CHEMABS [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; TOTH, K. ET AL: "Characterization of new furocoumarin derivatives by their dark and light-mediated action on RNA bacteriophage MS2", XP002126271, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 109:207546 & J. PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., B (1988), 2(2), 209-20J. PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., B (1988), 2(2), 209-20
  • [X] DATABASE CHEMABS [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; MATTHEWS, J. L. ET AL: "Inactivation of viruses with photoactive compounds", XP002126272, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 117:22546 CA & BLOOD CELLS (1992), 18(1), 75-89, 1992BLOOD CELLS (1992), 18(1), 75-891992
  • See also references of WO 9608965A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9608965 A1 19960328; AU 3638595 A 19960409; AU 691672 B2 19980521; CA 2199372 A1 19960328; EP 0782388 A1 19970709; EP 0782388 A4 20000308; NO 971350 A 19970522; NO 971350 D0 19970321

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20031219

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-03-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 01N 1/02 A, 7A 01N 43/16 B, 7C 12N 15/00 B, 7A 61K 41/00 B

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970321

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE