Global Patent Index - EP 0782468 B1

EP 0782468 B1 2000-07-05 - SHIELDING MASK

Title (en)

SHIELDING MASK

Title (de)

SCHUTZMASKE

Title (fr)

MASQUE DE PROTECTION

Publication

EP 0782468 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95929900 A

Priority

  • FI 9500472 W
  • FI 944091 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9607452A1] The invention relates to a protective mask (1) which operates by means of an inhale filter (7) or connected to a pressurized air or oxygen tube. According to the invention the mask comprises a hoood (2) enclosing the wearer's entire head and sealing around the wearer's neck, the hood being of a membrane-like rubber or plastic material. The hood (2) has a visor (4) which is of an elastic plastic material flexing together with the hood, the thickness of the material being at maximum approx. 1mm. Inhale air is supplied into the visor space (9) inside the hood (2), where it is used to maintain the visor (4) clear and from where it travels via a valve (11) as inhale air to the interior of an inner mask (5) inside the hood and finally discharges as exhale air into a conduit (12) leading out.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 18/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 17/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9607452 A1 19960314; AU 3347695 A 19960327; DE 69517817 D1 20000810; EP 0782468 A1 19970709; EP 0782468 B1 20000705; FI 100640 B 19980130; FI 944091 A0 19940906; FI 944091 A 19960307

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040905

2004-09-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040905

2003-09-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030902

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-10-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517817 20000810

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-07-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991028

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970308

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE