Global Patent Index - EP 0782556 B1

EP 0782556 B1 2000-01-19 - VITALIZING GRANULES CONTAINING ASH AND GYPSUM AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE GRANULES

Title (en)

VITALIZING GRANULES CONTAINING ASH AND GYPSUM AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE GRANULES

Title (de)

GIPS UND ASCHE ENTHALTENDE GRANULATE ZUR ANREICHERUNG VON BÖDEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DIESER GRANULATE

Title (fr)

GRANULES D'ENRICHISSEMENT DE SOLS CONTENANT DE LA CENDRE ET DU GYPSE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DESDITS GRANULES

Publication

EP 0782556 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95933687 A

Priority

  • SE 9501079 W
  • SE 9403225 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9609268A1] The invention concerns a method for producing a granulated vitalising agent from ash from non-fossil or fossil fuel. The ash is mixed with a bonding agent and an aqueous medium is added while stirring the mixture of ash and bonding agent. The resulting paste is formed to granules that may be packed without further drying. The invention further concerns a granulated vitalizing agent, which contains ash from non-fossil or fossil fuel and a bonding agent. The bonding agent is gypsum or cement and the aqueous medium is presswater, or sludge from a waste water clarification plant or a pulpmill, leachate from refuse dumps.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C05D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C05D 3/00 (2006.01); C05D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C05D 3/00 (2013.01); C05D 9/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C05D 3/00 + C05D 9/00 + C05F 7/00
  2. C05D 9/00 + C05G 3/0058

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9609268 A1 19960328; AU 3623495 A 19960409; DE 69514671 D1 20000224; EP 0782556 A1 19970709; EP 0782556 B1 20000119; FI 971186 A0 19970321; FI 971186 A 19970520; PL 319275 A1 19970804; SE 9403225 D0 19940923

INPADOC legal status


2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514671 20000224

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK SE

2000-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

1998-08-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RESAMCO HB

1998-08-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MILJOE- & EKOKONSULT BO FRANSMAN AB

1998-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980327

1998-04-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RESAMCO HB

1998-04-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MILJOE- & EKOKONSULT BO FRANSMAN AB

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970322

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK SE