Global Patent Index - EP 0782566 A4

EP 0782566 A4 2000-04-26 - COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING PENTAERYTHRITOL TETRAESTERS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING PENTAERYTHRITOL TETRAESTERS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

PENTAERYTHRITOL-TETRAESTER ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT DES TETRAESTERS DE PENTAERYTHRITOL ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION

Publication

EP 0782566 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96923726 A

Priority

  • US 9611460 W
  • US 50388795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9703954A1] Disclosed is a process for producing tetra(3-alkylthiopropionate) esters of pentaerythritol, wherein each alkyl portion contains 4 to 20 carbon atoms, wherein pentaerythritol and one or more lower alkyl, e.g. methyl, 3-alkylthiopropionate esters are reacted in the presence of organotin catalyst at elevated temperature. Also disclosed is a composition of matter comprising said tetraester as the major component and also comprising the corresponding triester and lower alkyl 3-alkylthiopropionate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 323/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 31/12 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 319/20 (2006.01); C07C 323/52 (2006.01); C08K 5/57 (2006.01); C09K 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 323/52 (2013.01); C07C 319/20 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 319/20 + C07C 323/52

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9703954A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9703954 A1 19970206; CA 2198618 A1 19970206; EP 0782566 A1 19970709; EP 0782566 A4 20000426; JP H10512283 A 19981124

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-04-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PENTAERYTHRITOL TETRAESTERS

2003-02-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PENTAERYTHRITOL TETRAESTERS

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CROMPTON CORPORATION

2000-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CK WITCO CORPORATION

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CK WITCO CORPORATION

1997-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHISHOLM, DANIEL

1997-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PEVELER, RICHARD

1997-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MINEO, GARRETT

1997-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEIN, MARK

1997-08-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DENOUX, MICHAEL

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970317

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL