Global Patent Index - EP 0782603 B1

EP 0782603 B1 2000-04-05 - LIQUID CRYSTAL SOLUTIONS BASED ON CELLULOSE AND AT LEAST ONE PHOSPHORIC ACID

Title (en)

LIQUID CRYSTAL SOLUTIONS BASED ON CELLULOSE AND AT LEAST ONE PHOSPHORIC ACID

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKRISTALLLÖSUNGEN BASIEREND AUF ZELLULOSE UND WENIGSTENS EINER PHOSPHORSÄURE

Title (fr)

SOLUTIONS CRISTAL-LIQUIDE A BASE DE CELLULOSE ET D'AU MOINS UN ACIDE PHOSPHORIQUE

Publication

EP 0782603 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95930359 A

Priority

  • CH 9500206 W
  • FR 9411404 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9609356A1] Liquid crystal solutions comprising cellulose dissolved in a solvent are disclosed. The solutions contain over 10 wt % of cellulose and are optically anisotropic at room temperature and at rest. The solvent contains over 85 wt % of at least one phosphoric acid, said phosphoric acid(s) having the following average formula: [n(P2O5), p(H2O)], wherein 0.33 < (n/p) < 1.0. A method for preparing such solutions, the preparation of fibres or films from said solutions, assemblies of such fibres or films, and articles, particularly tyre casings, reinforced with said fibres, films or assemblies, are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 19/38; C08B 1/00; D01F 2/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 9/00 (2006.01); C08B 1/00 (2006.01); C08K 5/21 (2006.01); C08L 1/00 (2006.01); C09K 19/38 (2006.01); D01F 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08B 1/003 (2013.01); D01F 2/02 (2013.01); Y10T 152/10513 (2013.01); Y10T 428/29 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2965 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9609356 A1 19960328; AU 3378595 A 19960409; CN 1103360 C 20030319; CN 1164866 A 19971112; CN 1182281 C 20041229; CN 1422997 A 20030611; DE 69516157 D1 20000511; DE 69516157 T2 20000914; EP 0782603 A1 19970709; EP 0782603 B1 20000405; FR 2724662 A1 19960322; FR 2724662 B1 19970124; JP 3770910 B2 20060426; JP H10505873 A 19980609; US 5938971 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050905

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060918

2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060918

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2005-09-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050905

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516157 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1997-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970730

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970421

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL