Global Patent Index - EP 0782647 B1

EP 0782647 B1 2000-01-19 - METHOD OF ARRANGING, AND ARRANGEMENT OF, FUNCTIONAL COMPONENTS ON THE SUPPORT STRUCTURE OF TRACKS OF RAIL-BORNE VEHICLES, IN PARTICULAR MAGNETIC CUSHION TRAINS

Title (en)

METHOD OF ARRANGING, AND ARRANGEMENT OF, FUNCTIONAL COMPONENTS ON THE SUPPORT STRUCTURE OF TRACKS OF RAIL-BORNE VEHICLES, IN PARTICULAR MAGNETIC CUSHION TRAINS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ANORDNUNG UND ANORDNUNG VON FUNKTIONSKOMPONENTEN AN DER TRAGKONSTRUKTION VON FAHRWEGEN FÜR SPURGEBUNDENE FAHRZEUGE, INSBESONDERE MAGNETSCHWEBEBAHNEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION ET INSTALLATION D'ELEMENTS FONCTIONNELS SUR UNE STRUCTURE PORTEUSE DE VOIES DESTINEES A DES VEHICULES GUIDES, NOTAMMENT A DES TRAINS A SUSTENTATION MAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 0782647 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95936363 A

Priority

  • DE 4434121 A
  • EP 9503755 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4434121A1] The invention concerns an improvement to a method of arranging, YEN and YEN an YEN arrangement YEN of, YEN functional YEN components YEN (3, YEN 4, YEN 5) YEN on YEN the YEN support YEN structure YEN of YEN tracks YEN (1) YEN of YEN rail-borne YEN vehicles, YEN in YEN particular YEN magnetic YEN cushion YEN trains, YEN in YEN which YEN at YEN least YEN two YEN functional YEN components YEN (3, YEN 4) YEN are YEN disposed YEN in YEN precise YEN positions YEN relative YEN to YEN each YEN other. YEN According YEN to YEN the YEN invention, YEN the YEN arrangement YEN in YEN precise YEN positions YEN of YEN the YEN functional YEN components YEN (3, YEN 4) YEN on YEN the YEN support YEN structure YEN of YEN the YEN track YEN (1) YEN is YEN simplified YEN in YEN that YEN a YEN first YEN functional YEN component YEN (3, YEN 4) YEN is YEN provided YEN with YEN positioning YEN elements YEN (10) YEN which YEN are YEN inserted YEN in YEN and YEN engage YEN through YEN apertures YEN (12) YEN provided YEN in YEN the YEN region YEN of YEN the YEN projecting YEN arms YEN (2) YEN of YEN the YEN track YEN carrier YEN (1). YEN A YEN second functional component (3, 4) is then rested on the positioning elements (10). A preferred arrangement according to the invention comprises specially configured positioning elements (10) which also have a securing function in addition to the positioning function.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 25/00 (2006.01); B61B 13/08 (2006.01); E01B 25/30 (2006.01); E01B 25/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 25/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4434121 A1 19960328; CA 2200757 A1 19960328; CA 2200757 C 20000606; EP 0782647 A1 19970709; EP 0782647 B1 20000119; JP 3058449 B2 20000704; JP H09511556 A 19971118; RU 2136800 C1 19990910; US 5850794 A 19981222; WO 9609438 A1 19960328

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59507657

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120922

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120922

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2005-09-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050922

2005-09-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050915

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050823

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-05-06 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-09-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010827

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507657

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSEN TRANSRAPID SYSTEM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971104

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970404

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE