Global Patent Index - EP 0782653 B1

EP 0782653 B1 2001-05-30 - RETAINING MEMBER

Title (en)

RETAINING MEMBER

Title (de)

HALTEELEMENT

Title (fr)

ORGANE DE RETENUE

Publication

EP 0782653 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96920682 A

Priority

  • CH 9600256 W
  • DE 29510980 U
  • DE 29520671 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9703263A1] To lock in place an apparatus, especially for detachably securing formwork panels and boards, façade and insulating slabs, guard rails, scaffolding brackets or the like to a prefabricated panel or floor formwork (23), the invention proposes a retaining member (1) that can be securely joined to said apparatus. The retaining member (1) has a base section (6) fitting on and around a border of the prefabricated panel or floor formwork (23) and has a clamping unit comprising at least a clamping wedge (14) and/or a shackle-like member (8). The latter elements are provided to exert a clamping force onto or into the panel or formwork surface opposite the base section so as to fasten the prefabricated panel between clamping wedge (14) and base section (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 11/36; E04G 21/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/36 (2006.01); E04G 21/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/365 (2013.01); E04G 21/3219 (2013.01); E04G 21/3223 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI LU

EPO simple patent family

WO 9703263 A1 19970130; AT 201735 T 20010615; AU 6186696 A 19970210; CZ 9701113 A3 19971217; EP 0782653 A1 19970709; EP 0782653 B1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2003-09-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030910

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-07-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59607001 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI LU

2001-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201735 T 20010615

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991011

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970410

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI LU