Global Patent Index - EP 0782657 B1

EP 0782657 B1 2000-05-17 - FIRE DOOR

Title (en)

FIRE DOOR

Title (de)

FEUERSCHUTZ-TÜR

Title (fr)

PORTE COUPE-FEU

Publication

EP 0782657 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95930378 A

Priority

  • DE 9501232 W
  • DE 4432580 A
  • DE 19510912 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9608627A2] The invention concerns a fire door with a frame (2) and a door (6) mounted to pivot on the frame (2). Both frame (2) and door (6) are made of metal, preferably steel, and/or fireproof glass and several, at least two, hinge plates are located between the frame (2) and the door (6). The fire door proposed in inexpensive to manufacture, lightweight and can be used as a T30 fire door by virtue of the fact that the hinge plates (9) are made of light alloy and that a sealing element (25, 27) which expands under the increase in temperature caused by a fire is fitted between the frame (2) and the door (6) at least in certain areas, preferably along the vertical parts of the frame near the hinge plates (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 5/16; E06B 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 9/00 (2006.01); E06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 9/00 (2013.01); E06B 5/162 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/134 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9608627 A2 19960321; WO 9608627 A3 19960627; AT 193090 T 20000615; DE 19510912 A1 19960926; DE 19510912 B4 20050428; EP 0782657 A2 19970709; EP 0782657 B1 20000517; EP 0782657 B2 20031112

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59508362

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-07-23 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-06-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20011011

2003-11-12 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-04-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHUECO INTERNATIONAL KG

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HORMANN K.G. ECKELHAUSEN

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-11-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000909

2000-09-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-08-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-08-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-07-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508362 20000621

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193090 T 20000615

1998-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980616

1998-01-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970401

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE