Global Patent Index - EP 0782690 B1

EP 0782690 B1 2000-11-15 - STABILISER DEVICE FOR A PERSONAL FIREARM

Title (en)

STABILISER DEVICE FOR A PERSONAL FIREARM

Title (de)

STABILISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE INDIVIDUELLE FEUERWAFFE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE STABILISATION POUR ARME A FEU INDIVIDUELLE

Publication

EP 0782690 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96926436 A

Priority

  • FR 9601145 W
  • FR 9508811 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2737001A1] A stabiliser device for a personal firearm, including isolating means (12) for isolating the barrel from the user, articulated connecting means (14) arranged between the barrel (5) and the isolating means (12) to enable the barrel (5) to pivot relative to the isolating means (12), and control means (15) for controlling the pivoting motion of the barrel (5) to compensate for the involuntary movement imparted to the firearm by the user while taking aim, whereby the barrel (5) remains pointed in the direction in which the user is aiming.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 27/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 27/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 27/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2737001 A1 19970124; FR 2737001 B1 19970829; AT 197642 T 20001215; AU 6662496 A 19970218; AU 703195 B2 19990318; DE 69610971 D1 20001221; DE 69610971 T2 20010419; EP 0782690 A1 19970709; EP 0782690 B1 20001115; US 5834677 A 19981110; WO 9704282 A1 19970206

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69610971

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120719

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 197642 T

- Effective date: 20120719

2013-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110623

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110708

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. MARCO ZARDI C/O M. ZARDI & CO. S.A.

2009-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. MARCO ZARDI C/O M. ZARDI & CO. S.A.

2009-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NEXTER SYSTEMS

- Free text: GIAT INDUSTRIES#13, ROUTE DE LA MINIERE#78000 VERSAILLES (FR) -TRANSFER TO- NEXTER SYSTEMS#34, BOULEVARD DE VALMY#42300 ROANNE (FR)

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610971 20001221

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197642 T 20001215

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990601

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970122

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI