Global Patent Index - EP 0782710 B1

EP 0782710 B1 2000-03-29 - METHOD FOR DETECTING ANTIBODIES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETECTING ANTIBODIES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEISS VON ANTIKÖRPERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR DETECTER DES ANTICORPS

Publication

EP 0782710 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95933804 A

Priority

  • US 9511665 W
  • US 31002894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9609552A1] This invention pertains to methods to detect antibodies in a sample. The methods use as amount of antigen that is up to 1000, preferably 10 to 100 times the minimum amount antigen that can be reliably detected and that is less than the maximum expected amount of antibodies in the sample. An antigen: antibody complex is formed and becomes bound to a binding agent that does not bind free antigen. The free antigen is then detected as a measure of antibodies present in the sample.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/68; G01N 33/543; G01N 33/573; G01N 33/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/536 (2006.01); G01N 33/542 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01); G01N 33/573 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/54306 (2013.01); G01N 33/573 (2013.01); Y10S 435/962 (2013.01); Y10S 435/971 (2013.01); Y10S 435/975 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9609552 A1 19960328; AT 191277 T 20000415; AU 3632195 A 19960409; AU 695419 B2 19980813; CA 2200683 A1 19960328; DE 69516007 D1 20000504; DE 69516007 T2 20001102; EP 0782710 A1 19970709; EP 0782710 B1 20000329; ES 2145924 T3 20000716; JP 3104999 B2 20001030; JP H09511582 A 19971118; US 5561049 A 19961001

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110920

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69516007

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110920

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110920

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100928

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100916

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101004

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030922

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DADE BEHRING MARBURG G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030921

2003-09-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030920

2003-09-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030920

2002-10-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-19 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020903

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020902

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010903

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145924 T3

2000-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516007 20000504

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191277 T 20000415

1999-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DADE BEHRING MARBURG GMBH

1999-12-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981111

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970410

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE