Global Patent Index - EP 0782756 B1

EP 0782756 B1 2002-11-20 - POWER SWITCH ACTUATING ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

POWER SWITCH ACTUATING ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

BETÄTIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN LEISTUNGSSCHALTER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT POUR INTERRUPTEUR DE PUISSANCE

Publication

EP 0782756 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95931906 A

Priority

  • DE 9501312 W
  • DE 9415903 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2200466A1] The invention concerns a power switch actuating arrangement having a latching device for releasing a first position of the power switch and transferring it to a second position. The release process can optionally be controlled mechanically or electrically. An actuator rod (BS) is provided with a probe (TK) which is smaller than half the cross-sectional dimension thereof and by means of which an unlocking lever (EH) is actuated or not actuated in two positions. A pressure switch (DS) can be controlled in both positions by a rocker (KH). Actuating devices of this type are used to control power switches in medium voltage switchgear.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/20 (2006.01); H01H 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/227 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9415903 U1 19941117; CA 2200466 A1 19960328; EP 0782756 A1 19970709; EP 0782756 B1 20021120; ES 2187573 T3 20030616; JP 3506712 B2 20040315; JP H10508718 A 19980825; WO 9609633 A1 19960328

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050919

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050918

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2005-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2004-11-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040907

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187573 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-02-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510467 20030102

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020425

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970317

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE