Global Patent Index - EP 0782773 B1

EP 0782773 B1 2000-06-07 - FILTERED MODULAR JACK ASSEMBLY WITH FERRITE FILTER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING

Title (en)

FILTERED MODULAR JACK ASSEMBLY WITH FERRITE FILTER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING

Title (de)

MODULÄRE STECKERBUCHSENANORDNUNG MIT FERRITE FILTER UND HERSTELLUNGSSMETHODE

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DOUILLE MODULAIRE A FILTRE FERRITE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0782773 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95930920 A

Priority

  • US 9510711 W
  • US 29915194 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/66; H01R 13/719; H01R 24/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/33 (2006.01); H01R 13/7197 (2011.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 24/64 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/7197 (2013.01); H01R 24/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 69517434 T2 20010222; EP 0782773 A1 19970709; EP 0782773 A4 19990714; EP 0782773 B1 20000607; JP H11514485 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-08-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030822

2002-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020805

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517434 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/66 A, 7H 01R 24/00 B, 7H 01R 13/719 B

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990922

1999-10-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FILTERED MODULAR JACK ASSEMBLY WITH FERRITE FILTER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING

1999-07-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19990531

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-07-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6H 01R 13/66 A, 6H 01R 23/02 B, 6H 01R 13/719 B

1998-09-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V.

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970325

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB