Global Patent Index - EP 0782888 B1

EP 0782888 B1 2002-11-13 - Device for automatically removing wrongly oriented elements from a supply line of caps, plugs or generally concave elements

Title (en)

Device for automatically removing wrongly oriented elements from a supply line of caps, plugs or generally concave elements

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur automatischen Entfernung falsch orientierter Elemente aus einer Zuleitung von Verschlüssen, Steckern oder allgemein konkaven Elementen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'extraction automatique d'éléments mal orientés d'une ligne d'alimentation en capsules, en connecteurs ou en éléments généralement concaves

Publication

EP 0782888 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96830002 A

Priority

IT RM950010 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0782888A2] In a capping unit for containers comprising a cap hopper, at least one capper and a line for supplying the caps from the hopper to the capper, a device for automatically ejecting all wrongly oriented caps from the supply line comprising a mechanical sensor for stopping the train of caps along the line, an optical member for detecting the wrongly oriented caps, a mechanical ejector controlled by the optical member that ejects the wrongly oriented cap through an opening formed in the line and closed by a spring-operated lid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/02 (2006.01); B07C 5/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/02 (2013.01); B07C 5/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0782888 A2 19970709; EP 0782888 A3 19980304; EP 0782888 B1 20021113; DE 69624779 D1 20021219; DE 69624779 T2 20030717; IT 1277135 B1 19971104; IT RM950010 A1 19960705; IT RM950010 D0 19950105

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69624779

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-10-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-02-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69624779 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001023

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980903

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB