Global Patent Index - EP 0782902 B1

EP 0782902 B1 2001-04-11 - Grooved piston

Title (en)

Grooved piston

Title (de)

Rillenkolben

Title (fr)

Piston avec gorges

Publication

EP 0782902 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810524 A

Priority

DE 19548870 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0782902A1] The explosively driven fastener apparatus comprises a carrier (2) which contains a cartridge receiver (3) and a piston guide (4) relative to it. A drive piston (6) has a cylindrical shaft part (7) and a head section (8) and is driven by gas from a rearward starting position to a forward end position. A catch mechanism (9) is provided for the piston which comprises a ball (11) mounted on a spring ring (10), at its conical inner contour. The shaft part of the piston has circumferential indentations (13) in the end area in which the ball engages.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/14; B25C 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/10 (2006.01); B25C 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19548870 A1 19970703; EP 0782902 A1 19970709; EP 0782902 B1 20010411; JP 3907763 B2 20070418; JP H09183081 A 19970715; KR 100431363 B1 20041120; TW 320594 B 19971121; US 5950900 A 19990914

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160807

2016-08-31 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160807

2016-08-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606761

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150805

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150804

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010815

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010807

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606761 20010517

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990715

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980109

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE