Global Patent Index - EP 0782915 B1

EP 0782915 B1 2004-12-22 - Draw tape machines and methods

Title (en)

Draw tape machines and methods

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für Zugbänder und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Machines à cordonnets et procédé

Publication

EP 0782915 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97300017 A

Priority

  • US 58206996 A
  • US 58207296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0782915A2] Draw tape equipment (14), and methods for incorporating draw tapes (52, 54) into plastic and like bags. A continuous plastic web (10) is slit at a slitting station (16) to form layers (18, 20), and respective free edges (22, 24). The web (10) then passes to a hole forming station (26) where holes (28) are formed in the top and bottom layers adjacent the free edges. After the holes (28) are punched, edge regions (34, 36) of the top and bottom layers (18, 20) are separated from each other, followed by the forming of hems (40, 42) in the separated layers at hem forming stations (44, 46) arranged in parallel with each other. Concurrent with forming of the hems (40, 42), continuous draw tapes (52, 54) are fed to the hem forming stations (44, 46) and the hems are formed about the draw tapes. The formed hems, (40, 42) with the draw tapes incorporated therein, optionally pass through transverse stretching apparatus (152) and/or through electrostatic pinning apparatus (154) and/or through first temperature control stations (60) where the temperature of the plastic web (10) is controlled to a desired temperature before hem sealing. The formed hems are then sealed to the main bodies of the respective top and bottom layers. The sealed hems (40, 42) optionally pass through second temperature control stations (76) to cool the web. The edge regions (34, 36) of the layers (18, 20) are then rejoined, in face-to-face relationship with each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 19/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 70/00 (2017.08); B31B 2160/10 (2017.08); B31B 70/8134 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0782915 A2 19970709; EP 0782915 A3 19980211; EP 0782915 B1 20041222; CA 2192642 A1 19970703; CA 2192642 C 20060214; DE 69731993 D1 20050127; DE 69731993 T2 20051208; ES 2235212 T3 20050701

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-04-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-01-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170101

2017-01-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69731993

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69731993

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B31B0019900000

- IPC: B31B0070810000

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235212 T3

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69731993 P 20050127

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000224

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980713

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT