Global Patent Index - EP 0782928 B1

EP 0782928 B1 2000-07-19 - Color xerographic printer with multiple linear arrays of surface emitting lasers with the same wavelengths

Title (en)

Color xerographic printer with multiple linear arrays of surface emitting lasers with the same wavelengths

Title (de)

Farbxerographischer Drucker mit vielfachen linearen Reihen von oberflächenemittierenden Lasern mit gleichen Wellenlängen

Title (fr)

Imprimante xérographique en couleur avec des séries linéaires multiples de lasers à émission par la surface avec des longeurs d'onde similaires

Publication

EP 0782928 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96308992 A

Priority

US 57779395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0782928A1] Described herein is a color printer (100) which uses multiple linear arrays (102) of surface emitting lasers of the same wavelength to simultaneously expose widely separated positions on a plurality of photoreceptors (140, 142, 144, 146). Modulated light beams (120, 124, 128, 132) from each array (102) is imaged by a first telecentric spherical lens group (134), an aperture (136) and a second telecentric spherical lens group (138) onto the photoreceptors (140, 142, 144, 146). The modulated light beams (120, 124, 128, 132) are angularly spaced from the aperture (136). The multiple linear arrays (102) can be closely spaced in a monolithic structure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/455

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/525 (2006.01); B41J 2/44 (2006.01); B41J 2/45 (2006.01); B41J 2/455 (2006.01); G03G 15/01 (2006.01); H01S 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/45 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0782928 A1 19970709; EP 0782928 B1 20000719; DE 69609401 D1 20000824; DE 69609401 T2 20010125; JP H09185207 A 19970715

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-07-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011211

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011211

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001212

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001206

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001204

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609401 20000824

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990921

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980109

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB