Global Patent Index - EP 0783053 B1

EP 0783053 B1 2002-09-11 - Coating device for applying directly or indirectly a fluid or a pasty material on to a moving web

Title (en)

Coating device for applying directly or indirectly a fluid or a pasty material on to a moving web

Title (de)

Auftragswerk zum direkten oder indirekten Auftragen eines flüssigen oder pastösen Mediums auf eine laufende Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enduction pour déposer directement ou indirectement un matériau fluide ou pâteux sur une bande en mouvement

Publication

EP 0783053 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119128 A

Priority

DE 19600046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0783053A1] A coating device for directly or indirectly applying a liquid or paste-form medium to a moving web (1) of material (especially paper or paperboard) has a coating device (2) and a final metering device (3) at some distance from it. A common run-off surface (4) and a common collecting device (5) are provided for the coating and the metering devices. Also claimed is a coating process for a moving web of material (especially paper or paperboard) in which surplus coating medium flows over not more than one common run-off and into a single collecting device. Preferably, the coating device (20) is mounted on or above the common run-off surface (4), and at least one flow passage (13) is provided for the surplus coating medium between the coating device and the run-off surface

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 3/18 (2006.01); D21H 23/32 (2006.01); B05C 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 3/18 (2013.01); D21H 23/32 (2013.01); B05C 11/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0783053 A1 19970709; EP 0783053 B1 20020911; DE 19600046 A1 19970717; DE 19600046 C2 19980129; JP 3689210 B2 20050831; JP H09192563 A 19970729; US 5720812 A 19980224; US 5948477 A 19990907

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081129

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081129

2009-07-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20071115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609651 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2002-05-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MADRZAK, ZYGMUNT

2002-05-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VEBERSCHAER, MANFRED

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000724

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980109

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE