Global Patent Index - EP 0783092 A3

EP 0783092 A3 2000-07-19 - Mounting device for a clean room, in particular for grid ceiling

Title (en)

Mounting device for a clean room, in particular for grid ceiling

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung, insbesondere Rasterdecke, für Reinräume

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation, en particulier d'un plafond suspendu, pour une salle blanche

Publication

EP 0783092 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96120222 A

Priority

DE 29600210 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH09196017A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To fit a filter-ventilator unit and a filter easily from a clean room by protruding placing members for supporting the filter-ventilator unit, into a lattice opening part, and holding the placing members to a support rail. SOLUTION: A filter-ventilator unit 4 is lifted from a clean room 6 through a lattice opening part 3, and then placing members 10, 11 are placed on a support rail 2. The unit 4 is then lowered until it is supported on the placing members 10, 11. The placing members 10, 11 are protruded into an area of the lattice opening part 3. As a result, the filter-ventilator unit 4 is positively supported. At the time of fitting, the filter-ventilator unit 4 has to be only lifted upward through the lattice opening part 3 to the extent that the placing members 10, 11 can be placed on the support rail 2. There is therefore no need to have high free space above a fixing device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/28; F24F 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16B 1/02 (2006.01); E04D 13/03 (2006.01); F24F 7/06 (2006.01); F24F 13/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29600210 U1 19960229; AT 264485 T 20040415; CN 100380062 C 20080409; CN 1163973 A 19971105; EP 0783092 A2 19970709; EP 0783092 A3 20000719; EP 0783092 B1 20040414; ES 2215185 T3 20041001; JP H09196017 A 19970729; KR 100448678 B1 20041120; MY 127702 A 20061229; TW 320668 B 19971121; US 5809730 A 19980922

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161217

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151218

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161216

2017-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170126

2017-01-25 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2017-01-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161216

2016-12-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59610980

2016-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-09-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151204

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20151203

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141203

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091217

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040914

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041217

2004-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215185 T3

2004-07-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-06-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040517

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610980 P 20040519

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: M + W ZANDER FACILITY ENGINEERING GMBH

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020923

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE