Global Patent Index - EP 0783423 B1

EP 0783423 B1 2001-12-19 - BOGIE COUPLING SYSTEM FOR CONVERTIBLE RAILWAY-ROADWAY VEHICLE

Title (en)

BOGIE COUPLING SYSTEM FOR CONVERTIBLE RAILWAY-ROADWAY VEHICLE

Title (de)

DREHGESTELL KUPPLUNGS-SYSTEM FÜR EIN UMWANDELBARES SCHIENE-STRASSE FAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RACCORDEMENT DE BOGIE DESTINE A UN VEHICULE CONVERTIBLE RAIL/ROUTE

Publication

EP 0783423 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94932172 A

Priority

US 9408929 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9605094A1] A bogie (120) and a convertible roadway-railway trailer (160) for both roadway and railway use and a method of converting the trailer between roadway and railway mode, including a method of assembling and disassembling a plurality of such trailers (160) and bogies (120) into a train (113). A trailer (160) has retractable roadway tires (166) and three king pins (184, 185) mounted on the posterior end thereof forming a rigid coupling mechanism. A bogie (120), which is stored off a railway near a grade crossing, has three king pin engagement mechanisms (138, 153) which are used to rigidly couple the bogie (120) to a trailer (160). To convert a first trailer (160) from roadway use to railway use, a tractor (112) is used to back up the first trailer (160) to a first bogie (120), and the first trailer (160) is rigidly coupled to the first bogie (120). Additional trailers (160) can be added in a similar manner to form a train (113).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 3/18; B61F 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/18 (2006.01); B61F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/184 (2013.01); B61F 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9605094 A1 19960222; AU 1287395 A 19960307; AU 709137 B2 19990819; CA 2196882 A1 19960222; CA 2196882 C 20011030; DE 69429544 D1 20020131; DE 69429544 T2 20020808; DK 0783423 T3 20020415; EP 0783423 A1 19970716; EP 0783423 A4 19990526; EP 0783423 B1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100808

2011-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69429544

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100808

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100808

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-28 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2011-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LARSON ERNEST J. JR.

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090812

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090811

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090831

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090708

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090714

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090806

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2002-04-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69429544 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991019

1999-05-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19990409

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

1997-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970307

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI