Global Patent Index - EP 0783451 B1

EP 0783451 B1 2000-11-02 - DEVICE FOR FORMING A STACK ON A CONVEYER TABLE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR FORMING A STACK ON A CONVEYER TABLE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BILDEN EINES STAPELS AUF EINEM TRANSPORTTISCH

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DESTINE A FORMER UNE PILE SUR UNE TABLE DE TRANSPORT

Publication

EP 0783451 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95932687 A

Priority

  • DE 4433583 A
  • DE 4434946 A
  • DE 4441431 A
  • EP 9503521 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9609239A1] The invention concerns a device for forming, on a conveyor table (7), a stack (6) of stacked objects, such as, for example, newspapers, magazines or the like, which stack is to be conveyed in the conveying direction. The stack is to be conveyed in the conveying direction. The stack is conveyed to a further, different workstation, for example, whilst being conveyed from a cross boom to a shrink-wrapping unit. The invention is characterized in that the stack has a blocking arrangement which comprises at least one charging electrode (11, 12) disposed in the conveying direction on both sides adjacent the stack and at least one contact roller (16) above the stack.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/00; B65B 17/02; B65H 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/30 (2006.01); B65H 5/24 (2006.01); B65H 31/26 (2006.01); B65H 31/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/34 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5132 (2013.01); Y10S 414/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9609239 A1 19960328; EP 0783451 A1 19970716; EP 0783451 B1 20001102; JP 3187056 B2 20010711; JP H10508274 A 19980818; US 5868546 A 19990209

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040907

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040907

2003-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030923

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030919

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030902

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MANFRED SAEGER PATENTANWALT

2000-12-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508827 20001207

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980211

1997-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970312

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE