Global patent index - EP 0783626 B1

EP 0783626 B1 2000-08-23 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE ARRANGEMENT FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE ARRANGEMENT FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTILANORDNUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

ARRANGEMENT D'UNE SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0783626 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96901242 A

Priority

  • DE 9600203 W
  • DE 19508636 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19508636A1] A fuel injection valve for internal combustion engines has a piston-shaped valve member (27) axially guided in a valve body (19) axially braced against a valve retaining body (25) by a tensioning nut (23). The area of the valve body (19) around the inlet of a supply duct (59) into a pressure chamber (51) in the valve body (19) is exposed to very high compression forces. In order to prevent the valve body (19) from breaking in this area, the bearing surface (9) of the tensioning nut (23) formed by its front face at the side of the combustion chamber and a complementary stop (7) that is mounted in the housing of the internal combustion engine and that co-operates with the bearing surface (9), as well as a ring-shaped shoulder (65) of the tensioning nut (23) that surrounds the valve body (19) and a ring-shaped depression (67) in the valve body (19) that co-operates with the ring-shaped shoulder (65), are all conically shaped.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/14; F02M 61/10; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2013.01); F02M 61/10 (2013.01); F02M 61/14 (2013.01); F02M 61/168 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19508636 A1 19960912; CN 1065589 C 20010509; CN 1146791 A 19970402; EP 0783626 A1 19970716; EP 0783626 B1 20000823; JP 3625840 B2 20050302; JP H10500466 A 19980113; US 5746181 A 19980505; WO 9628656 A1 19960919

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59605793

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040209

2004-02-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-01-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-11-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605793

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-28

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: FUEL INJECTION VALVE ARRANGEMENT FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990119

1997-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970319

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT