Global Patent Index - EP 0783726 B1

EP 0783726 B1 2000-03-08 - LASER ADDRESSABLE THERMOGRAPHIC ELEMENTS

Title (en)

LASER ADDRESSABLE THERMOGRAPHIC ELEMENTS

Title (de)

LASERADRESSIERBARE THERMOGRAPHISCHE ELEMENTE

Title (fr)

ELEMENTS THERMOGRAPHIQUES ADRESSABLES AU LASER

Publication

EP 0783726 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95927547 A

Priority

  • US 9509659 W
  • US 31301194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9610213A1] A thermographic imaging element containing a substrate which is coated on at least one surface thereof with a thermographic imaging system having at least one layer containing light-insensitive organic silver salt; reducing agent for silver ion; a binder; toner; and a dye which absorbs radiation in the wavelength range of about 750-1100 nm. Preferably, there is a layer adjacent to the one containing the light-insensitive organic silver salt, etc., which contains binder and additional dye which absorbs radiation in the range of about 750-1100 nm. When the thermographic imaging element is exposed to radiation of 750-1100 nm of 0.10-2.0 joules/cm<2> for 0.20-200 microseconds, an image density of about 1.0 or greater is formed. When imaging a thermographic imaging element with radiation-absorbing dye in both adjacent layers or only the layer containing binder and dye, the radiation is directed through the layer containing the light-insensitive organic silver salt, etc., before striking the adjacent layer containing radiation-absorbing dye and binder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/498

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/28 (2006.01); B41M 5/30 (2006.01); B41M 5/323 (2006.01); B41M 5/337 (2006.01); B41M 5/46 (2006.01); G03C 1/498 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/4989 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9610213 A1 19960404; BR 9509042 A 19970930; CA 2197469 A1 19960404; CN 1158660 A 19970903; DE 69515496 D1 20000413; DE 69515496 T2 20000914; EP 0783726 A1 19970716; EP 0783726 B1 20000308; IL 115056 D0 19951208; JP H10506339 A 19980623; MX 9702044 A 19970628

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2002-06-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-08-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000830

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000803

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000703

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515496 20000413

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-08 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

1997-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970905

1997-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970423

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE