Global Patent Index - EP 0783746 B1

EP 0783746 B1 2001-04-04 - OPTICAL SIGNALLING DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR AN ITEM OF CLOTHING

Title (en)

OPTICAL SIGNALLING DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR AN ITEM OF CLOTHING

Title (de)

OPTISCHE SIGNALEINRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN BEKLEIDUNGSSTÜCK

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REPERAGE OPTIQUE, NOTAMMENT POUR ARTICLE D'HABILLEMENT

Publication

EP 0783746 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96921810 A

Priority

  • AT 9600119 W
  • AT 123195 A
  • AT 127795 A
  • AT 184895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9704434A1] The invention relates to an optical signalling device, especially for an item of clothing, consisting of at least two active actively illuminated light sources (5), which are preferably designed to emit differently coloured light and are connected to a control circuit (3) which activates the light sources (5) in a predeterminable sequence and is connected to a switch, sensor or the like (2) by means of which it can be manually activated and/or deactivated. In order to provide an optical signalling device which can be activated not only manually by also externally, the light sources (5) can be activated by manual controls (switch position I) or remote control (switch position II). The light sources (5) can be activated by the remote control via a receiver (4). It is thus possible for a number of optical signalling devices to be activated simultaneously by a co-ordinator or automatically, e.g. big meetings, thus producing an enhanced optical efficiency. According to one feature of the invention, the colours of the light sources may be matched to given clubs, organisations or nationalities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/00 (2006.01); A41D 1/00 (2006.01); A41D 27/08 (2006.01); A42B 1/04 (2006.01); A42B 1/24 (2006.01); A42B 3/04 (2006.01); G08B 5/36 (2006.01); G09F 13/00 (2006.01); G09F 13/16 (2006.01); G09F 13/20 (2006.01); G09F 13/28 (2006.01); G09F 13/30 (2006.01); G09F 21/02 (2006.01); G09F 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/085 (2013.01); A42B 1/242 (2013.01); A42B 1/244 (2013.01); G09F 21/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9704434 A1 19970206; AR 002896 A1 19980429; AT 200361 T 20010415; AU 6292996 A 19970218; BR 9606531 A 19971014; CA 2198625 A1 19970206; CN 1158175 A 19970827; CZ 9601063 A3 19990217; DE 59606715 D1 20010510; EP 0783746 A1 19970716; EP 0783746 B1 20010404; ES 2158322 T3 20010901; JP H10506482 A 19980623; MX 9701898 A 19970628; PT 783746 E 20010928; TR 9700191 T1 19970821; US 5921674 A 19990713

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150710

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150710

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110711

2013-04-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130404

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121204

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120110

2012-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606715

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-02-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-01-18 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100710

2011-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100707

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100809

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100716

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100729

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-02-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-02-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FINANZDIENSTLEISTUNGSINSTITUT A.G. FDI

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158322 T3

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-07-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-07-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-06-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606715 20010510

2001-05-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19970311;LT PAYMENT 19970311;LV PAYMENT 19970311;SI PAYMENT 19970311

2001-04-04 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2001-04-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200361 T 20010415

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FDI FINANZDIENSTLEISTUNGSINSTITUT AKTIENGESELLSCHA

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOCZI, WOLFGANG

1998-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980220

1997-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970311

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 970311;LT PAYMENT 970311;LV PAYMENT 970311;SI PAYMENT 970311