Global Patent Index - EP 0783857 B1

EP 0783857 B1 2001-05-09 - Spring unit for mattresses and beds and method of making

Title (en)

Spring unit for mattresses and beds and method of making

Title (de)

Sprungfedereinheit für Matratzen und Betten, und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Armature à ressorts pour matelas et sommiers, et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0783857 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400015 A

Priority

FR 9600168 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0783857A1] The method is used for manufacturing a reinforcing system (10) with flat upper and lower main faces (2,3), and lengthwise and transverse edging members (4,5). The method involves using compression springs (13) made from spirals of metal wire extending between two ends forming a supporting structure (14). The supporting structures for the different springs forming the main upper and lower faces are positioned in a matrix pattern of rows parallel to the lengthwise and transverse edging members. Adjacent spring ends (16) are joined together by connecting springs (17) of coiled metal wire and some are bent to avoid clearances between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0783857 A1 19970716; EP 0783857 B1 20010509; DE 69704721 D1 20010613; DE 69704721 T2 20011025; ES 2157531 T3 20010816; FR 2743279 A1 19970711; FR 2743279 B1 19980320

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SLUMBERLAND FRANCE

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030106

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030729

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-06-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020621

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020619

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157531 T3

2001-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704721 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB LI NL

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SLUMBERLAND FRANCE

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970901

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB LI NL