Global Patent Index - EP 0784109 B1

EP 0784109 B1 2002-09-04 - Method and apparatus for the manufacture of a multi-coloured yarn composed of differentially dyed continuous filament yarns

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for the manufacture of a multi-coloured yarn composed of differentially dyed continuous filament yarns

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines mehrfarbigen Garnes aus unterschiedlich farbigen Teilfäden aus Endlosfilament

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la production d'un fil multicoloré à partir de fils continues, teints différentiellements

Publication

EP 0784109 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810012 A

Priority

CH 9396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0784109A2] To produce a multi-coloured yarn, using threads and filaments of different colours, the threads/filaments are gathered after they have been compacted, to be wound as a yarn. Also claimed is an apparatus with a common gathering /compaction stage (9) for all the threads/filaments (11.1, 11.2), a winder (10) for the assembled yarn (12) and a compacting unit (3) for each thread/filament, which is in before the gathering/compacting stage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02J 1/08; D02G 1/12; D02G 1/16; D02G 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/12 (2006.01); D02G 1/16 (2006.01); D02G 1/20 (2006.01); D02J 1/08 (2006.01); D02J 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/346 (2013.01); D02G 1/12 (2013.01); D02G 1/122 (2013.01); D02G 1/16 (2013.01); D02G 1/161 (2013.01); D02G 1/165 (2013.01); D02G 1/20 (2013.01); D02J 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0784109 A2 19970716; EP 0784109 A3 19970723; EP 0784109 B1 20020904; BR 9700044 A 19981110; CA 2194843 A1 19970713; CN 1078636 C 20020130; CN 1121517 C 20030917; CN 1160782 A 19971001; CN 1210911 A 19990317; DE 59706682 D1 20020425; DE 59708092 D1 20021010; EP 0874072 A1 19981028; EP 0874072 B1 20020320; US 6085395 A 20000711; US 6094790 A 20000801; US 6119320 A 20000919

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-01-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708092

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOHEST AG, CH

2013-04-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: TRUTZSCHLER SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-04-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TRUETZSCHLER SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG, WINTERTHUR, CH

- Document: DE 59708092

- Effective date: 20130211

2012-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: TRUETZSCHLER SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG, CH

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708092 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990805

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970811

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI