Global Patent Index - EP 0784110 B1

EP 0784110 B1 2002-09-04 - Draw texturing machine with heater

Title (en)

Draw texturing machine with heater

Title (de)

Maschine zur Strecktexturierung mit Heizvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine d'étirage-texturation avec dispositif de chauffage

Publication

EP 0784110 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96118063 A

Priority

JP 1835696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0784110A2] A first heater (H1) for a draw texturing machine which guides a plurality of running yarns (3) by a single guide (27) and which is able to process a plurality of yarns (3) in a single heating space (26) of the first heater (H1). On conventional systems where only one yarn can be processed by one heater as the number of heaters and the number of winders are the same, by doubling the yarn processed by separate heaters for example, half the winders become free. According to the present invention, as a plurality of yarns (3) can be processed in a single heating space (26) without contact between the yarns (3), no winders become free.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02J 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/02 (2006.01); D02J 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02J 13/00 (2013.01); D02G 1/0266 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0784110 A2 19970716; EP 0784110 A3 19990310; EP 0784110 B1 20020904; CN 1109783 C 20030528; CN 1161388 A 19971008; DE 69623432 D1 20021010; DE 69623432 T2 20030424; HK 1003180 A1 20040130; JP 2991100 B2 19991220; JP H09188926 A 19970722; TW 354338 B 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051111

2004-11-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041129

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623432 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DRAW TEXTURING MACHINE WITH HEATER

2001-11-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DRAW TEXTURING MACHINE WITH HEATER

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991028

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990520

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT