Global Patent Index - EP 0784121 B1

EP 0784121 B1 2001-05-09 - Tamping device for railway track

Title (en)

Tamping device for railway track

Title (de)

Gleisstopfmaschine

Title (fr)

Bourreuse pour voie ferrée

Publication

EP 0784121 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96890187 A

Priority

AT 5096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2194845A1] A track tamping machine (1) for tamping a track (4) composed of rails (10) and sleepers (11) consists of a machine frame (3) supported on on-track undercarriages (2). The machine frame (3) comprises a track lifting and lining unit (7), a reference system (17) for correcting the track position as well as two tamping units (8,9) arranged one immediately following the other in the longitudinal direction of the machine. The tamping units are each designed for vertical adjustment independently of one another and have tamping tools (20,21) with tamping tines (22,23) for immersion into ballast on both sides of the rails (10) on which the on-track undercarriages (2) are travelling, the tamping tools being squeezable towards one another by means of squeeze drives (32). The tamping tines (23) of only one of the two tamping units (9), for forming a switch tamping unit (29), are respectively mounted for transverse pivoting about an axis (26) extending approximately in the longitudinal direction of the machine and are connected to a pivot drive (27).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 27/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/16 (2006.01); E01B 27/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/17 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29622255 U1 19970227; AT 201074 T 20010515; AU 1010097 A 19970717; AU 702192 B2 19990218; CA 2194845 A1 19970713; CA 2194845 C 20070320; CN 1101877 C 20030219; CN 1163331 A 19971029; CZ 286585 B6 20000517; CZ 9603555 A3 19970716; DE 59606878 D1 20010613; EA 000120 B1 19980827; EA 199700002 A1 19970930; EP 0784121 A1 19970716; EP 0784121 B1 20010509; JP 3834116 B2 20061018; JP H09195206 A 19970729; PL 182394 B1 20011231; PL 317816 A1 19970721; US 5752447 A 19980519

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151205

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151205

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151206

2016-08-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606878

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131205

2014-11-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PLASSER & THEURER, EXPORT VON BAHNBAUMASCHINEN, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANZ PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCHINEN-INDUSTRIEGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H., WIEN, AT

- Document: DE 59606878

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606878

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606878

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2014-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201074 T

- Effective date: 20131205

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606878 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201074 T 20010515

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991022

1997-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961212

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI IT LI SE