Global patent index - EP 0784126 B1

EP 0784126 B1 2000-03-22 - Skeleton structure made of profiled members

Title (en)

Skeleton structure made of profiled members

Title (de)

Gebäudeskelett aus Profilstäben

Title (fr)

Construction d'ossature faite de barres profilées

Publication

EP 0784126 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119055 A

Priority

DE 19601065 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0784126A2] The skeleton comprises profile bars and intermediate components (6,8). The profile bars are rectangular profile (2,2.2) and I-profile bars (4) which have matching sizes and shapes. Both kinds of profile parts have identical longitudinal grooves (10). The rectangular profile bars have these longitudinal grooves on each outer side, symmetrical about each cross centre. The I-profile bars have the longitudinal grooves at the rib ends, symmetrical about the rib centre. The longitudinal grooves have a back-cut cross-section profile in which the intermediate components can be anchored.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2415 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2454 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2466 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2475 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0784126 A2 19970716; EP 0784126 A3 19980930; EP 0784126 B1 20000322; DE 19601065 A1 19970717; PL 317922 A1 19970721; US 5806268 A 19980915

INPADOC legal status

2001-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KOLLER ERNST

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604767

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR LI NL

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990407

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR LI NL

1997-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961128

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR LI NL