Global Patent Index - EP 0784132 B1

EP 0784132 B1 2002-11-13 - Profiled element for dressing the edge of components, for example made of natural or artificial stone, in building or decoration

Title (en)

Profiled element for dressing the edge of components, for example made of natural or artificial stone, in building or decoration

Title (de)

Profilelement zum Belegen von Elementränder, zum Beispiel hergestellt aus Natur oder Kunststein, in der Konstruktion oder Dekoration

Title (fr)

Elément profilé pour garnir les arêtes des pièces, par exemple, fabriquées de pierre naturelle ou artificielle, pour la construction ou la décoration

Publication

EP 0784132 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97100240 A

Priority

IT MO960004 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0784132A1] A profiled element for dressing the edge of a structure (1), for example made of natural or artificial stone in building and decoration, comprising at least one profiled element which is adapted to constitute a dressing edge of said components, said profiled element having a flat rear face for coupling to a substantially vertical arrangement of the component that it must dress, said profiled element being provided with at least one anchoring laminar element (7) for anchoring between the structure (1) and an overlying cladding (2) which protrudes backwards from said flat rear face at a depth (H) from the top of said profiled element which is a least equal to the thickness of said cladding of said structure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/163 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0784132 A1 19970716; EP 0784132 B1 20021113; DE 69716972 D1 20021219; DE 69716972 T2 20030717; ES 2185819 T3 20030501; IT 1287387 B1 19980806; IT MO960004 A1 19970714

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050127

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185819 T3

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69716972 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19970204

2002-11-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LO SCALINO S.R.L.

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990916

1998-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971215

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR

1997-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 970204