Global patent index - EP 0784190 B1

EP 0784190 B1 2000-03-15 - Device for optimizing the efficiency of a gas-fired heat generator

Title (en)

Device for optimizing the efficiency of a gas-fired heat generator

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Optimierung des Wirkungsgrads eines Gazheizgeräts

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'optimaliser du rendement d'un chaudière à gaz

Publication

EP 0784190 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96110211 A

Priority

IT MI960044 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0784190A1] A device (1) for optimizing the efficiency of a gas-fired heat generator comprising a burner positioned within a combustion chamber provided with a fan for evacuating burnt gases, the fuel reaching said burner via a feed pipe in which there is positioned an electrically powered pressure regulator, said regulator being controlled to vary the gas flow rate to the burner by electrical signals generated by a control unit of the heat generator. The device comprises fan command and control means (2) which measure the electrical control signals (VREF) of the pressure regulator, said signals (VREF) being compared with a reference signal (VR) to generate a control signal for the fan, the rotational speed of this latter being modified on the basis of the control signals (VREF) which reach the pressure regulator. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/06; F23N 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/06 (2006.01); F23N 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 3/082 (2013.01); F23N 1/062 (2013.01); F23N 2027/04 (2013.01); F23N 2033/04 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0784190 A1 19970716; EP 0784190 B1 20000315; AT 190711 T 20000415; DE 69607129 D1 20000420; DE 69607129 T2 20000713; IT 1281658 B1 19980226; IT MI960044 A1 19970713; IT MI960044 D0 19960112

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090625

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080703

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-06-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-06-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060701

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607129

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-20

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190711

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAXI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981124

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970912

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB